Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Town Of Los Gatos, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Goldfarb & Lipman Llp, against Capri Associates Llc, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryOther Real Property Unlimited (26) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time285 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS Text = (Atty J. Cox) Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS Decision = M Closed = 10/11/2006 |
|
October 05, 2006 | Hearing |
Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Judge: Department 9 |
|
August 30, 2006 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = atty Juliet E. Cox Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej Decision = M Closed = 08/31/2006 |
|
August 10, 2006 | Hearing |
Review: Mediation Status
Judge: Department 2 |
|
August 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice: Settlement Text = conditional settlement (Juliet Cox) Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Settlement Decision = M Closed = 08/10/2006 |
|
May 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing (no fee) Legacy Name = ARB-Ntc of Mediation Status Conf Decision = M Closed = 05/11/2006 |
|
May 09, 2006 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 2 |
|
May 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = "Atty Scheer" Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 05/01/2006 |
|
April 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = (Cox) Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 04/24/2006 |
|
February 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Text = S Scheer Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees Decision = M Closed = 02/23/2006 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.