Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Daniel Vien filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time454 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2007 | Hearing |
Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Judge: Department 2 |
|
February 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = atty Stephan Barber Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej Decision = M Closed = 03/01/2007 |
|
February 26, 2007 | Hearing |
Jury Trial: Long Cause
Judge: Department 10 |
|
February 21, 2007 | Hearing |
Conference: Settlement Jury
Judge: Department 10 |
|
February 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice: Settlement Text = of entire case (Stephan Barber) Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Settlement Decision = M Closed = 02/09/2007 |
|
October 10, 2006 | Hearing |
Conference: Trial Setting
Judge: Department 10 |
|
August 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Substitution: Attorney Text = Old: pro per; New: Pham Legacy Name = CV Substitution of Attorney Decision = M Closed = 08/21/2006 |
|
August 10, 2006 | Hearing |
Review: Mediation Status
Judge: Department 10 |
|
July 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = atty stephan barber Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 07/13/2006 |
|
July 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Substitution: Attorney Text = old: alfred wright, new: pro per Legacy Name = CV Substitution of Attorney Decision = M Closed = 07/12/2006 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.