Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Huong Minh Nguyen, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2006 |
CategoryChange Of Name |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Name Change Text = 2/14/06 - Signed By Judge Edwards Legacy Name = CV OSC:Name Change Decision = M Closed = 01/05/2006 |
|
February 14, 2006 | Hearing | Hearing: OSC Name Change | |
February 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Decree: Name Change Legacy Name = CV Decree Changing Name Decision = G Closed = 02/14/2006 |
|
January 30, 2006 | Docket Event |
Affidavit: Proof of Publication Text = San Jose Post Record Legacy Name = CV Proof of Publication Decision = M Closed = 02/02/2006 |
|
January 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
CLETS Form Legacy Name = CV Confid CLETS Report/Adult Decision = M Closed = 01/18/2006 |
|
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
Petition: Name Change Text = w/clets; $ 299.50 Paid Legacy Name = CV Petn:Name Change/fee Decision = M Closed = 01/05/2006 |
|
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 01/05/2006 |
|
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.