Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bruce E. Ratcliff filed a(n) Other Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42) case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2005 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions161 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgement Text = From San Mateo County, new case# 115925. Legacy Name = CV Acknowledge Receipt Decision = M Closed = 12/08/2006 |
|
December 05, 2006 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 2 |
|
October 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgement of Receipt: Transfer Text = Green Postal Card Recvd Legacy Name = CV Receipt on Transfer Returned/Filed Decision = M Closed = 10/13/2006 |
|
October 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Santa Clara Co. Superior Court's case, # 105CV055488, is ordered transferred and COORDINATED with San Mateo Co. Superior Court case#, PRO114122, per amended order filed on 8/02/06 filed in San Mateo Co. Superior Court. Legacy Name = CV Other |
|
October 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc: Change of Venue Out Decision = M Closed = 10/04/2006 |
|
September 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order Text = granting leave of court to transfer/coordinate case # 105CV055488 with San Mateo Co. Superior Court case#, PRO114122. Judge Elfving Legacy Name = CV Order Decision = G Closed = 10/04/2006 |
|
September 05, 2006 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 2 |
|
August 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = atty john fiegel Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 08/23/2006 |
|
August 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = C. Riffle M. Barker Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 08/21/2006 |
|
June 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order Text = denying complex coordination - Judge Rosemary Pfeiffer, San Mateo County Legacy Name = CV Order Decision = M Closed = 06/29/2006 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.