Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Greengrass Furnishings Corp., filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Hai Tran, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2005 |
CategoryOther Petition (Not Spec) Unlimited (43) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2007 | Hearing |
Hearing: Order of Examination
Judge: Department 16 |
|
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
Application: Order of Examination Text = Hai Tran 2-6-07 9:00 AM D-16) Jon O. Blanda 818 716 7630 Legacy Name = CV Appl/Ord:Appear/Exam of Debtor Decision = M Closed = 12/18/2006 |
|
August 17, 2006 | Hearing |
Hearing: Order of Examination
Judge: Department 16 |
|
July 13, 2006 | Hearing |
Hearing: Order of Examination
Judge: Department 16 |
|
May 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 05/16/2006 |
|
March 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
Application: Order of Examination Text = HAI TRAN; 7-13-06 9:00 AM D-16 Legacy Name = CV Appl/Ord:Appear/Exam of Debtor Decision = M Closed = 03/29/2006 |
|
February 28, 2006 | Hearing |
Hearing: Order of Examination
Judge: Department 16 |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Application: Order of Examination Text = Hai Tran; set for 2-28-06 D-16 Legacy Name = CV Appl/Ord:Appear/Exam of Debtor Decision = M Closed = 12/29/2005 |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment: Filed (from another court) Legacy Name = CV Abstract-Out of County Decision = M Closed = 12/29/2005 |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Declaration Text = of Jon O BLanda Legacy Name = CV Declaration Decision = M Closed = 12/29/2005 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.