Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
David A. Yomtov, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case against Lyn Louise Dearborn, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with William J. Monahan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam J. Monahan Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2005 |
CategoryPetition Re:Arbitration Award Unlimited (11) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions56 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time2945 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice Text = hearing Legacy Name = CV Ntc of... Decision = M Closed = 01/21/2014 |
|
February 23, 2006 | Hearing |
Hearing: Confirm Arbitration Award
Judge: Department 16 |
|
February 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
Judgment Text = confirming arb award - for plt david a. yomtov $31,000 judgment against def lyn louise dearborn signed by judge mckenney Legacy Name = CV Judgment Decision = M Closed = 02/23/2006 |
|
February 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment: Issued Legacy Name = CV Abstract of Judgment Decision = M Closed = 02/23/2006 |
|
February 09, 2006 | Hearing |
Hearing: Confirm Arbitration Award
Judge: Department 16 |
|
January 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 01/04/2006 |
|
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 12/30/2005 |
|
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Text = petition for confirmation of arbitration award; 02/09/06; 9 am; d-16 (pro per) Legacy Name = CV Ntc of Hearing re: Decision = M Closed = 12/30/2005 |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Petition (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Text = to confirm arbitration award; (David A. Yomtov) Summons Issued Legacy Name = CV Petn:UnLtd Decision = M Closed = 02/23/2006 |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.