Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Angel Warda, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 28, 2005 |
CategoryFraud Unlimited (16) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions175 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Satisfaction Legacy Name = CV Acknow/Satisf of Jgmt Full Decision = M Closed = 08/21/2008 |
|
August 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Substitution: Attorney Text = old Ison Law Firm, APC; new pro per Legacy Name = CV Substitution of Attorney Decision = M Closed = 08/07/2008 |
|
October 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List (Court) Legacy Name = CV Exhibit Receipt Decision = M Closed = 06/02/2008 |
|
October 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Text = Good cause appearing it is hereby ordered tha tthe above referenced trial exhibits be released to defense counsel. Trial exhibits [A through O] and PLT's Exhibit 17. Signed by Judge huber Legacy Name = CV Order Decision = M Closed = 10/19/2007 |
|
October 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Application: Ex Parte (Fee Applies) Text = for release of trial exh; decl of Laura Liccardo Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Appl Decision = M Closed = 10/19/2007 |
|
September 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order: Submitted Matter Text = Re Motion for Attorney Fees Granted in amount of $2,265.62 by Judge Garabaldi Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter Decision = M Closed = 09/20/2007 |
|
September 18, 2007 | Hearing |
Attorney Fee Allowance
Judge: Department 11 |
|
September 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Response/Reply Text = memo p&as in sup mtn to strike and/or tax costs, R. Donald McNeil Legacy Name = CV Reply Decision = M Closed = 09/11/2007 |
|
September 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections Text = opposition to Defs' motion to strike and/or tax costs (christine kawamoto) Legacy Name = CV Opposition Decision = M Closed = 09/10/2007 |
|
September 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 09/10/2007 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.