Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Benchmark Realty Advisors filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Thang Nguyen Barrett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThang Nguyen Barrett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management3703 days |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2005 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions597 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Minute Order
Date: September 07, 2018Minute Order
Date: June 06, 2019Minute Order
Date: March 07, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2021 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Department 21 |
|
October 20, 2020 | Hearing |
Motion: Order
Judge: Department 21 |
|
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Mail | |
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerk Rejection Letter ENV#4774393 / Notice: Previously filed documents cannot be resubmitted for filing. Please remove filing stamp. |
|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration: In Support | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion: Other HRG: 10/20/20; 9am; d21 RE: Adding William Kennedy to Judgment Judge: Thang Nguyen Barrett |
|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice RE: Termination of Stay |
|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Mail | |
March 05, 2020 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Department 21 |
|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.