Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Lobel Financial Corp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lobel, Gary Dean, Esq., against Maloney, Krista, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Salter, Timothy W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSalter, Timothy W Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty: Limited (Conversion) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions113 days |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time113 days |
Civil Complaint
Date: December 31, 2013Request for Dismissal - Party Only
Date: April 09, 2014Order to Show Cause: Pre-Disposition
Date: December 01, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Opposition to Claim of Exemption Order to Show Cause: Pre-Disposition Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Opposition to Claim of Exemption Opposition to Claim of Exemption Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Determining Claim of Exemption | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Opposition to Claim of Exemption Opposition to Claim of Exemption Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Opposition to Claim of Exemption Opposition to Claim of Exemption Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Claim of Exemption | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Opposition to Claim of Exemption | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Confidential Statement of Jgmt Debtor's Social Security No | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption | |
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.