Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gonzalez, Juan, People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Salter, Timothy W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSalter, Timothy W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2015 |
CategoryAsset Forfeiture: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 05, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Pursuant to Stipulation | |
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Pursuant to Stipulation | |
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
June 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
December 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.