Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Hill, Robert, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 16, 2001 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Summons with Proof of Service As to Robert Hill Filed
Date: January 10, 2002Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Date: November 27, 2001Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: February 07, 2002Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 13, 2002Complaint Breach of Contract Filed
Date: November 16, 2001For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.