Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Katie Zollerlamette, filed a(n) Limited Civil case against Tito Estrada, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 05, 2001 |
CategoryLimited Civil |
Last RefreshedMay 19, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Returned Mail: Filed
Date: February 05, 2018Complaint Personal Injury Auto Dismissed
Date: May 11, 2017Civil OSC Commenced and Completed
Date: May 11, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail: Filed Filing |
|
May 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Paper File Destroyed Filing |
|
May 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Complaint Personal Injury Auto Dismissed Ruling |
|
May 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil OSC Commenced and Completed Hearing |
|
April 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Filed Filing |
|
April 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Hearing Reset to Civil OSC 05/11/2017 01:30 PM D- 511 ScheduleHearing |
|
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail: Notice of Hearing Filed Filing |
|
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil OSC 04/06/2017 01:30 PM D- 511 ScheduleHearing |
|
June 05, 2001 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Katie Zollerlamette Filing |
|
June 05, 2001 | Docket Event |
Summons on Complaint Issued Issue |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.