Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Scientific Information Tech Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Srv Ayaswamy Sri, Strataserv Inc, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Lisa J. Steingart presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLisa J. Steingart Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2001 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2002 | Docket Event |
Judgment Text = Document -- Judgment for Defendant. Operator: HD Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Filed Plaintiff: Scientific Information Tech Inc -- Venue Confirmed, Date: Defendant(S): Strataserv Inc Comment: All Notified By Mail On 1/28/02;Exhibits Released To All Parties By Mail On 1/28/02 Legacy Name = Judgment Decision = M Closed = 01/22/2002 |
|
January 07, 2002 | Hearing |
Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant
Judge: Department 86 |
|
January 07, 2002 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Hearing Motion: H998 -- Unpaid Invoices 11/16/01 Decision = M Closed = 01/07/2002 |
|
January 07, 2002 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Document -- Appearance Minutes. Operator: HD Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Filed By: Commissioner Lisa Steingart Party Name: Scientific Information Tech Inc By Sunil Vathody- Party Name: President Party Name: Strataserv Inc By Sri Ayaswamy Proceedings: Date: No Date, Time: No Time -- Minutes Are Recorded As Follows: Submission To Court Comment: Declaration Of Authority To Represent A Party Filed By Both Parties Legacy Name = Other [CV] Decision = M Closed = 01/07/2002 |
|
January 07, 2002 | Docket Event |
Not Active Text = Hearing Result Posting -- Date: , Time: 08:30, Dept: 86, Operator: HD Bail Amount: $0.00, Bail Status Code/Name: None/No Status Provided Legacy Name = conversion - other Decision = M Closed = 01/07/2002 |
|
December 14, 2001 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Text = Document -- Proof of Service On. Description: Srv Aiyaswamy On 12/14/01 Operator: HD Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Filed Legacy Name = Proof of Service-Small Claims Decision = M Closed = 12/14/2001 |
|
December 06, 2001 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 06, 2001 | Docket Event |
Not Active Text = Complaint -- SCMN Money-Converted Legacy Document 1A. Dept: Not Specified, Operator: CW Fee Amount: $35.00, Complaint Amount: $2,400.00 Case Does Not Involve a Military Party Complaint Summons Not Issued Number of Additional Unidentified Persons Potentially Affected by Judgment: 0 Legacy Name = conversion - other Decision = M Closed = 12/06/2001 |
|
December 06, 2001 | Docket Event |
Not Active Text = Hearing -- Date: 01/07/2002, Time: 08:30 SC01 Small Claims-Converted Legacy Document 3B. Dept: 86 Operator: Fee Amount: $0.00, Bail Amount: $0.00, Bail Status Code/Name: None/No Status Provided Legacy Name = conversion - other Decision = M Closed = 12/06/2001 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.