Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Richard Edward Ehrhart, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2002 |
CategoryDissolution Summary Joint Petition |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2002 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family) Legacy Name = Ntc of Entry of Jgmt [FL] Decision = M Closed = 12/16/2002 |
|
December 04, 2002 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Summary Dissolution Legacy Name = Jgmt of Dissolution - Joint Petition Decision = M Closed = 12/16/2002 |
|
October 31, 2002 | Docket Event |
FC 2336 Packet Received for Review Legacy Name = 2336 Packet Decision = M Closed = 10/31/2002 |
|
October 31, 2002 | Docket Event |
Petition: Amended Legacy Name = Amd Petition [Family] Decision = M Closed = 10/31/2002 |
|
August 29, 2002 | Docket Event |
FC 2336 Packet Received for Review Legacy Name = 2336 Packet Decision = M Closed = 08/29/2002 |
|
December 27, 2001 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 27, 2001 | Docket Event |
Petition: Summary Dissolution Legacy Name = Joint Petition for Summary Dissolution Decision = M Closed = 12/27/2001 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.