Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Santa Clara, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by District Attorney - Santa Clara, against Jose M. Arroyo, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2002 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Bulk Scanned Documents | |
June 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS Legacy Name = FL Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS Decision = M Closed = 06/14/2006 |
|
May 30, 2006 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal, Entire Action Without Prejudice Legacy Name = Req:Dismissal,Entire W/O Prej Decision = M Closed = 05/30/2006 |
|
October 31, 2002 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons Filed Legacy Name = Proof of Service of Summons [FL/DA/CP] Decision = M Closed = 11/08/2002 |
|
February 04, 2002 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons Filed Legacy Name = Proof of Service of Summons [FL/DA/CP] Decision = M Closed = 02/04/2002 |
|
December 28, 2001 | Docket Event |
Summons and Complaint DCSS Legacy Name = Govt Compl/Est Parental Rel/Support Decision = M Closed = 12/28/2001 |
|
December 28, 2001 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.