Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Santa Clara, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by District Attorney - Santa Clara, against Daniel K. Van Epps, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Gregory H. Saldivar presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory H. Saldivar Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2002 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Bulk Scanned Documents | |
August 22, 2002 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Notice of Entry (Civil) Legacy Name = Notice of Entry of Judgment Decision = M Closed = 08/22/2002 |
|
July 26, 2002 | Docket Event |
Other Text = 4251 advisement Legacy Name = Other [FL/DA/CP/DV]... Decision = M Closed = 07/26/2002 |
|
July 22, 2002 | Hearing |
Hearing: Motion hearings
Judge: Department 95 |
|
July 22, 2002 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Personal Text = jdgmt (otp) (R's atty, Mary Bird) Legacy Name = Proof of Personal Service Decision = M Closed = 07/26/2002 |
|
July 22, 2002 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Estab Parent Relat/Supt Legacy Name = Jgmt Est Parental Relationship/Supp [DA] Decision = M Closed = 07/26/2002 |
|
April 19, 2002 | Docket Event |
Motion (Family) Legacy Name = Ntc of Mtn [DA] Decision = M Closed = 04/19/2002 |
|
February 28, 2002 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Personal Legacy Name = Proof of Personal Service Decision = M Closed = 03/08/2002 |
|
February 25, 2002 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint DCSS (no fee) Legacy Name = Answer: Govt Compl/Est Parental Rel/Supp Decision = M Closed = 02/25/2002 |
|
January 18, 2002 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail Legacy Name = Proof of Service by Mail [CPHR] Decision = M Closed = 01/30/2002 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.