Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Santa Clara, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by District Attorney - Santa Clara, against Charles D Huynh, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Edward F. Mills presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEdward F. Mills Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 01, 2015 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2018 | Hearing | Motion: Other (no fee) | |
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration: Income and Expense | |
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing | |
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Bulk Scanned Documents | |
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion (dcss) mod. c/s; health care; review payback on arrears; lc |
|
October 01, 2015 | Hearing |
OSC: Enforcement
Judge: Edward F. Mills |
|
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice: Limited Scope Representation Text = relieved as atty Legacy Name = FL Ntc:Ltd Scope of Representation Decision = M Closed = 10/08/2015 |
|
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Short Form Order After Hearing Legacy Name = FL Short Form Order after Hearing Decision = M Closed = 10/07/2015 |
|
April 23, 2015 | Hearing |
OSC: Enforcement
Judge: Edward F. Mills |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.