Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Julie Marie Olvera, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Charles A. Daley, Megan Dee Schroeder, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2001 |
CategoryAuto Unlimited (22) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
May 17, 2002 | Docket Event |
Decision Text = MOTION Description NTC: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF ACTION FAILURE TO APPEAR ALL PARTIES Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
May 09, 2002 | Hearing |
Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear
Judge: Department 4 |
|
May 09, 2002 | Docket Event |
Notice: Dismissal of Action Text = Result Text: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF ACTION FAILURE TO APPEAR ALL PARTIES DATE:4-26-02 Decision = M Closed = 05/09/2002 |
|
April 26, 2002 | Docket Event |
Decision Text = MOTION Description NTC: OSC RE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO ATTEND CASE MGMT CONF Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
April 23, 2002 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 4 |
|
December 27, 2001 | Docket Event |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Text = MOTION Description > COMPLAINT FILED; SUMMONS ISSUED; CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED (IN PRO PER - JULIE OLVERA) Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
December 27, 2001 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.