Case Last Refreshed: 5 years ago
Gcfs, Inc., A California Corporation, filed a(n) Civil case against Billy Ray Ingram, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Wiley W. Manuel Courthouse.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 14, 2000 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMarch 08, 2019 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseWiley W. Manuel Courthouse |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2001 | Document_Filed | Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed | |
July 05, 2001 | Document_Filed | Writ of Execution - Unsatisfied from Alameda Filed | |
April 20, 2001 | Action | Writ of Execution Issued To Alameda | |
April 20, 2001 | Document_Filed | Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for GCFS, Inc., a California corporation | |
June 21, 2000 | Action | Abstract of Judgment Issued | |
June 02, 2000 | Document_Filed | Default Judgment (Money) Entered | |
June 02, 2000 | Action | Default Judgment (Money) | |
June 02, 2000 | Action | Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) As to Billy Ray Ingram Entered | |
June 02, 2000 | Document_Filed | Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) Filed for Billy Ray Ingram | |
June 02, 2000 | Document_Filed | Summons with Proof of Service As to Billy Ray Ingram Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.