Case Last Refreshed: 5 years ago
Thomas Banks, filed a(n) Civil case against Jon D Biegenzahn, Hawkeye Holding Company, Llp, Hollis General Partnership, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Wiley W. Manuel Courthouse.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 14, 2000 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMarch 08, 2019 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseWiley W. Manuel Courthouse |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2002 | Hearing |
FTC w/ Local Rules 4.5
Judge: Patrick J. Zika |
|
January 14, 2002 | Document_Filed | Complaint - Damages Dismissed | |
January 14, 2002 | Document_Filed | Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Completed | |
November 13, 2001 | Hearing |
FTC w/ Local Rules 4.5
Judge: Patrick J. Zika |
|
November 13, 2001 | Document_Filed | Hearing Continued to Civil OSC - Complaints dept: 135 date: 01/14/2002 time: 09:00 AM | |
November 13, 2001 | Document_Filed | Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued | |
October 30, 2001 | Document_Filed | Returned Mail: Minute Order Filed | |
October 18, 2001 | Document_Filed | Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed | |
October 10, 2001 | Hearing |
Motion to Compel
Judge: Demetrios P. Agretelis |
|
October 10, 2001 | Document_Filed | Motion to Compel Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.