Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ianni, Dawn E filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with SEXTON, ANDREA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSEXTON, ANDREA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 19, 2020 |
CategoryFamily - Other Family Law |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MINUTES K WRIGHT: COMMISSIONER ANDREA C. SEXTON: BAILIF R. BARGAS 8:38 A.M. Matter called. Petitioner, Dawn Ianni is present in pro per. Respondent, James Ianni is present in pro per.There are no other appearances. 8:38 A.M. Parties are sworn. Discussion ensues as to mediation. Parties have reached an agreement in mediation and the stipulation is presented to the court. Parties agree to a small change as to Christmas Eve and Christmas Day. Ms. Ianni is to have Christmas Eve 2021 and Mr. Ianni is to have Christmas Day 2021. Court writes in the Christmas Holiday agreement and on any holiday when the children are with Respondent, parties shall work cooperatively to schedule a few hours for Petitioner to see the minor children (i.e. drop off gifts and have a short visit) Stipulation is executed in open court. | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CUSTODY AND/OR VISITATION OF CHILDREN | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT BY: Amanda Halvorson | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER FROM CLERK REJECTION LETTER FROM CLERK TO DAWN IANNI. REASON FOR REJECTION: Other: NEXT HEARING DATE IS INCORRECT ON PAGE 1 #9 AND ON PAGE 2 #3. ITEM REJECTED: FINDINGS AND ORDER AFTER HEARING |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MINUTES K WRIGHT: COMMISSIONER ANDREA C. SEXTON: BAILIFF E. LARSON Prior to the commencement of the hearing the commissioner advisement is given and parties are sworn. 9:41 A.M. Matter called. Petitioner, Dawn Ianni, is present in pro per. There are no other appearances. The court orders the parties to mediation on March 24, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. The court sets a review hearing for March 29, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 3 as to possible visitation agreement. Petitioner is to have a Phone/Facetime call with the boys every night before 7:30 p.m. Petitioner, Ms. Ianni is to prepare a Findings and Order after Hearing. Matter recalled. Respondent, James Ianni is now present. There are no other appearances. The court informs respondent of the mediation date and the date of the next hearing. | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF MEDIATOR Event: FCS MEDIATION Date: 03/24/2021 Time: 10:30 am Judge: FCS, CALENDAR Location: FAMILY COURT SERVICES CALENDAR Result: MEDIATION SUCCESSFUL
Judge: FCS, CALENDAR |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER REFERRING MATTER TO MEDIATION PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON 3/18/21 | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: FAMILY LAW REVIEW HEARING Date: 03/29/2021 Time: 8:30 am Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3 Result: HEARING OCCURRED-ORDERS MADE
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: The following event: PETITION FOR GRANDPARENT VISITATION scheduled for 01/25/2021 at 8:30 am has been rescheduled as follows: Event: PETITION FOR GRANDPARENT VISITATION Date: 03/15/2021 Time: 8:30 am Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3 Result: HEARING OCCURRED-ORDERS MADE
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 11/24/2020. PARTY SERVED JAMES H IANNI COPIES OF ATTACHMENT, CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITAITON APPLICAITON ATTACHMENT, CHILDRENS HOLIDAY SCHEDULE ATTACHMENT, DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA-COMPLETED, PETITION FOR GRANDPARENTS ISITAITON, REQUEST FOR ORDER, RESPONSIVE DECLARATION (BLANK), STANDARD RESTRAINING ORDER, SUMMONS-CUSTODY AND SUPPORT IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of DAWN E IANNI (PETITIONER) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.