Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Tarrant, Flavia G., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Tarrant, Dustin, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Don R. Franchi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDon R. Franchi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 09, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMay 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Family Law Status Conference
Judge: Franchi, Don R. |
|
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by MAIL & ACKNOWLEDGMENT SERVICE (in CA) of Petition for Dissolution of Marriage/Domestic Partnership |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document Returned: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS returned to PETITIONER Reason: INCOMPLETE |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration Regarding Service of Final Declaration of Disclosure and Income & Expense Declaration filed. Service Date: 10/20/2020 |
|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition for Dissolution of Marriage/Domestic Partnership | |
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of ADR | |
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and Status Conference | |
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.