Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Marra, Lynn Michelle, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Marra, Fabrizio Bernard, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Don R. Franchi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDon R. Franchi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMay 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Family Law Status Conference
Judge: Franchi, Don R. |
|
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and Status Conference | |
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response to Dissolution of Marriage/Domestic Partnership |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration Under UCCJEA Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction & Enforcement Act |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of ADR | |
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of Petition for Dissolution of Marriage/Domestic Partnership |
|
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of ADR | |
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and Status Conference | |
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.