Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Koenig, Robert, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Koenig, Anne, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Don R. Franchi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDon R. Franchi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Restraining Order Hearing
Judge: Southern DVPA/TRO, - |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing Granted |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event | DV - Documents Picked Up | |
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Attorney Specially Appeared: Via Zoom Perett, Attorney on behalf of the Respondent. |
|
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Restraining Order Hearing
Judge: Mazzei, Cristina |
|
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order received/forwarded to Judicial Officer - Public
Judge: Franchi, Don R. |
|
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of Notice OfCourt Hearing (Dv-109); Child Custody And Visitation Order; Confidential Clets Information; Supervised Visitation And Exchange Order; Request For Domestic Violence Restraining Order; Request For Child Custody And Visitation Orders Dv-100: Recent Abuse Declaration Of Petitioner In Support OfHis Request For Temporary Restraining Order; Declaration Re: Notice OfEx Parte Application For Orders; Blank ProofOf Service By Mail (Clets); Blank Response To Request For Domestic Violence Restraining Order; How Can I Respond To Request For Domestic Violence Restraining Order?; Ex Parte Family Law Department Dv/Tro |
|
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Granted |
|
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.