Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Meyer, Alicia Gloria, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Meyer, Steven Michael, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Sean P. Dabel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSean P. Dabel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJune 04, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Family Law Status Conference
Judge: Dabel, Sean P. |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order SPOUSAL OR PARTNER SUPPORT , ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS Judge: Dabel, Sean P. |
|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and Status Conference | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of ADR | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response & Request for Dissolution (Divorce) of Marriage/Domestic Partnership |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration OF ALI YOUSEFI ESQ IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR $10,000 IN NEED-BASED ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order re: SPOUSAL OR PARTNER SUPPORT , ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS |
|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of Petition for Dissolution of Marriage/Domestic Partnership |
|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and Status Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.