Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cousins, Coreen, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Amsden, Zachary, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Sean P. Dabel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSean P. Dabel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMay 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Family Law Status Conference
Judge: Dabel, Sean P. |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order RE: Child Custody and Child Support
Judge: Dabel, Sean P. |
|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and Status Conference | |
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration Under UCCJEA Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction & Enforcement Act |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response & Request for Dissolution (Divorce) of Marriage/Domestic Partnership |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of ADR | |
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration re: Notice of Ex Parte Application for Orders | |
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Cover Sheet | |
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order & Court Order re: CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT, SPOUSAL OR PARTNER SUPPORT AND ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS, OTHER ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR SERVICE AND HEARING |
|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF BARBARA J. KUEHN, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR SERVICE AND HEARING OF HER REQUEST FOR ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.