Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Williams, Gus, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Stephens, Juanetta, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Hugo R. Borja presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHugo R. Borja Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Restraining Order Hearing
Judge: Borja, Hugo R. |
|
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing Signed By: HON. HUGO R. BORJA Date Signed: 10/28/2020 |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of DV-109 AND DV-110, DV-116 |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Restraining Order Hearing
Judge: Mazzei, Cristina |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing Granted |
|
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of RESTRAINING ORDDER AND RESTRAINING ORDER RESPONSE |
|
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte sent to Judicial Officer
Judge: Holt, Rachel E. |
|
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Granted |
|
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte sent to Judicial Officer PRIORITY 1 Judge: Dabel, Sean P. |
|
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event | DV-TRO Ex Parte Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.