Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jose, Natalie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Jose, Fortonato, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Rachel E. Holt presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRachel E. Holt Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMay 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Family Law Status Conference
Judge: Holt, Rachel E. |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of Summons (FL-110); Petition-Marriage/Domestic Partnership (FL-100); Response-Marriage/Domestic Partnership (FL-120) |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by MAIL of FL-140, 141, 142, 150 |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration Regarding Service of Preliminary Declaration of Disclosure and Income & Expense Declaration filed. Service Date: 9/15/2020 |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Amended Summons Issued / Filed | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition - Petition for Dissolution of Marriage/Domestic Partnership |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and Status Conference | |
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition for Dissolution of Marriage/Domestic Partnership | |
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.