Finley Deidre, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Ratner David S., against Dawson Gregory, Dawson Isabel, Dawson Rosario, Vazquez Gustavo, represented by Kossoff Alan, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Moskwith David Sotelo presiding.
Case Number(Subscribe to View) Track Case Changes |
JudgeDavid Sotelo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management264 days |
Filing DateOctober 18, 2019 |
CategoryCivil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions264 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Matter TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: Deidre Finley (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Deidre Finley (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Deidre Finley (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Disassociation of Attorney; Filed by: Tasha A. Hill (Attorney)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Deidre Finley (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Disassociation of Attorney; Filed by: Tasha A. Hill (Attorney); As to: Deidre Finley (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Updated -- Amended Complaint: Filed By: Deidre Finley (Plaintiff); Result: Rejected; Result Date:
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Notice NOTICE TO APPEAR AT THE HEARING ON NOVEMBER 13, 2020; Filed by: Deidre Finley (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Rosario Dawson (Defendant); Isabel Dawson (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Declaration (OF ALAN KOSSOFF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Deidre Finley (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Deidre Finley (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Deidre Finley (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Deidre Finley (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Rosario Dawson (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Deidre Finley (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Deidre Finley (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by Deidre Finley (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Deidre Finley (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Deidre Finley (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st) Filed by Deidre Finley (Plaintiff); Deidre Finley (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Deidre Finley (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Deidre Finley (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer (CCP...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Amended Complaint (2nd) Filed by Deidre Finley (Plaintiff); Deidre Finley (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Deidre Finley (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Disassociation of Attorney Filed by Tasha A. Hill (Attorney)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Rosario Dawson (Defendant); Isabel Dawson (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Deidre Finley (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sa...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing (***Voided due to clerical error****) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions Filed by Rosario Dawson (Defendant); Isabel Dawson (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by Rosario Dawson (Defendant); Isabel Dawson (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Hearing on Mo...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by David S. Ratner (Attorney)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE TO APPEAR AT THE HEARING ON NOVEMBER 13, 2020) Filed by Deidre Finley (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Amended Complaint (3rd amended complaint.) Filed by Deidre Finley (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Independent Medical Examination o...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions Filed by Rosario Dawson (Defendant); Isabel Dawson (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sa...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Deidre Finley (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sa...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Answer (TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Notice (evidentiary objections)
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Amended Complaint (2nd)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing (***Voided due to clerical error****)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (notice of electronic service)
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (proof of electronic service)
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Reply (iso motions)
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE TO APPEAR AT THE HEARING ON NOVEMBER 13, 2020)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ADVANCEMENT OF HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Declaration (OF AMBER MELIUS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer (CCP...))
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sa...))
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sa...))
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer;))
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: May 25, 2021Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sa...))
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer;) of )
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Independent Medical Examination o...))
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Declaration (OF AMBER MELIUS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR TERMINATING AND MONETARY SANCTIONS)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Declaration (OF ALAN KOSSOFF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Hearing on Mo...))
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES)
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (As to causes of action on 2nd amended complaint: 1-18)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of )
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ADVANCEMENT OF HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice (DEFENDANTS ROSARIO DAWSON AND ISABEL DAWSON?S EXPERT WITNESS DESIGNATION)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer;) of 11/20/2019)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer;))
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer (CCP...))
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Amended Complaint (2nd)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (proof of electronic service)
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/01/2020)
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/05/2020)
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (notice of electronic service)
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES)
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Notice (evidentiary objections)
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Reply (iso motions)
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Hearing on Mo...))
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (As to causes of action on 2nd amended complaint: 1-18)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Amended Complaint (3rd amended complaint.)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Answer (TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing (***Voided due to clerical error****)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Declaration (OF AMBER MELIUS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ADVANCEMENT OF HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Notice (DEFENDANTS ROSARIO DAWSON AND ISABEL DAWSON?S EXPERT WITNESS DESIGNATION)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE TO APPEAR AT THE HEARING ON NOVEMBER 13, 2020)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ADVANCEMENT OF HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF AMBER MELIUS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR TERMINATING AND MONETARY SANCTIONS)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Independent Medical Examination o...))
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 05/21/2021)
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sa...))
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sa...))
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sa...))
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.