Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Sheinbaum, Jordan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSheinbaum, Jordan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 29, 2019 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Party: Respondent Schaeffer, Val William |
|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Party: Respondent Schaeffer, Val William |
|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order | |
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order - No Fee Party: Petitioner Schaeffer, Lauren Goldstein |
|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration for Default and Uncontested Filed Party: Petitioner Schaeffer, Lauren Goldstein |
|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Appearance Stipulation & Waiver - No Fee Party: Petitioner Schaeffer, Lauren Goldstein |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Document Filed | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Further Status Conference
Judge: Gallagher, John |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.