We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Eloise Rosenblatt Vs Nina Sahota Cheema

Case Last Refreshed: 5 days ago

Eloise M Rosenblatt, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Nina K. Sahota Cheema, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Maureen A. Folan presiding.

Case Details for Eloise M Rosenblatt v. Nina K. Sahota Cheema

Judge

Maureen A. Folan Track Judge’s New Cases

Filing Date

August 01, 2019

Category

Breach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06)

Last Refreshed

November 23, 2023

Practice Area

Commercial

Filing Location

Santa Clara County, CA

Matter Type

Breach of Contract

Filing Court House

Santa Clara

Parties for Eloise M Rosenblatt v. Nina K. Sahota Cheema

Plaintiffs

Eloise M Rosenblatt

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Defendants

Nina K. Sahota Cheema

Case Documents for Eloise M Rosenblatt v. Nina K. Sahota Cheema

Minute Order

Date: November 12, 2019

Minute Order

Date: February 28, 2020

Case Events for Eloise M Rosenblatt v. Nina K. Sahota Cheema

Type Description
Hearing Review: Civil Early Settlement Conf Status

Judge: Maureen A. Folan

Docket Event Proof of Service: Mail
Docket Event Order Granting application for continuance of July 16, 2020 Mediation status conference. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED. that a hearing on the Mediation Status Conference shall occur on October 29, 2020, at 10:30 Am. Dept. 6 of this court. The Court expects outstanding discovery to be completed and pparticipation in a Rule 4 mediation completed by October 29th court date. Signed by Judge Folan, Dept. 6

Judge: Maureen A. Folan

Docket Event Ex Parte Application
Reqiest of Eloise Rosenblatt, Plaintiff for Continuance of Mediation Status Conference of July 16, 2020
Docket Event Clerk Rejection Letter
Notice requires proper caption page. Case# 19cv352109 on envelope does not match case #113FL165853
Docket Event Proof of Service: Mail
Proof of Service by Mail toAtty Hector Moreno of Rosenblatt's Lis Pendens and Lien for Attorneys Fees
Docket Event Minute Order
Hearing Review: Civil Early Settlement Conf Status

Judge: Maureen A. Folan

Docket Event Proof of Service: Mail
Docket Event Declaration
of Eloise M. Rosenblatt on Filing of Lien for Atty Fees Against Sale of Cheema House Ordered By Judge Monahan.
See all events