Case Last Refreshed: 6 days ago
Dale M. Lacroix, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Shaun Setareh, against Foster Farms, Llc, Foster Poultry Farms, represented by Christian Joseph Rowley, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Superior with Brian C. Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian C. Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2019 |
CategoryOther Employment Unlimited (15) |
Last RefreshedMarch 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time195 days |
This complaint alleges violations of the Fair Credit Reporting Act (FCRA) and similar California laws by defendants FOSTER FARMS, LLC, FOSTER POULTRY FARMS, and DOES 1 through 50. The plaintiff, Dale M. Lacroix, claims that the defendants obtained co...
Conference: Case Management
Date: May 17, 2019Acknowledgement of Receipt: Transfer
Date: August 15, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 10, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Acknowledgement of Receipt: Transfer | |
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Receipt: Certified Mail | |
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice: Transmittal (Transfer Out) to Merced County. |
|
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Stipulation & Order to Transfer Venue to Superior Court of California, County of Merced - signed/BCW |
|
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice CMC set for 8/16/19 at 10am in D1 Judge: Brian C. Walsh |
|
May 17, 2019 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Brian C. Walsh |
|
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference | |
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance of Counsel. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.