Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Silveira, Nicole A., against Joyner, Christopher Anthony, Junior, represented by Hutson, Tina, Sok, Curtis B, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Hollman, James presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHollman, James Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 11, 2019 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedSeptember 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Proof
Date: February 03, 2020Arraignment: Warrant
Date: February 18, 2021Proof
Date: March 23, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sentencing Hearing
Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Proof Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Proof Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sentencing Hearing
Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sentencing Hearing
Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Proof Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Proof Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bail Bond Exonerated
Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Proof Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment: Warrant Judge: Slocum, Steven |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.