Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Beyder Eliza, Beyder Individually Janna, Beyder Stella, Janna Beyder As Trustee Of The Janna Beyder Family Trust, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Lebedev Gennady L, Ludwig Mitchell Brian, Luna Eduardo, against Beyder Eliza, Provident Funding Associates Lp, represented by Janner Lenny, Shem-Tov Shalem, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys East with Michael B. Harwin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael B. Harwin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management125 days |
Filing DateOctober 31, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
|
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys East |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Lenny Janner (Attorney)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Stella Beyder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order (Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Brief Settlement Conference Statement; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Request for Lodging of Original Deposition Transcript; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine Number 3; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Reply Eliza Beyder Reply Brief; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Shalem Shem-Tov (Attorney)
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine Number Six; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine number seven re attorney elon berk; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Reply to plaintiff request for lodging of original transcript; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to Plaintiffs first motion in limine; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Objection Objection to Janna Beyder Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2023-04-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Interlocutory Judgment for Partition; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00Order Re: Motion for Attorneys' Fees per CCP 128.7; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-03T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-27T00:00:00Tentative Statement of Decision and Findings of Fact; Proposed Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Janna Beyder, individually (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-16T00:00:00Declaration of Lenny Janner re partition; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2023-05-01T00:00:00Proposed Order Appointing Referee; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-11T00:00:00Reply Reply to Opposition to Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: Stella Beyder (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-06-13T00:00:00Reply Reply to Objection to Tentative Statement of Decision; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2023-05-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2023-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2023-06-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Janna Beyder, individually (Plaintiff); As to: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2023-06-23T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2023-04-14T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: Stella Beyder (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-04-20T00:00:00Reply Reply Brief on Motion for Attorney Fees on Partition; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-04-25T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Stella Beyder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Stella Beyder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-14T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Motion in Limine Number One to Preclude Settlement Discussions; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Provident Funding Associates, LP (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Conference Call re scheduling of MSC) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Brief Eliza Beyder Closing Brief; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Brief Settlement Conference Statement; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Stella Beyder (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to Motion to Compel Further Responses; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Conference call re continuance of trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-29T00:00:00Order Re: Amended Motion for Attorneys' Fees on Partition; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-03T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion to Withdraw; Filed by: Stella Beyder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-03-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine 13 to Preclude new claims of monetary theft; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2023-06-15T00:00:00Motion in Limine Motion in Limine Number 13; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2023-06-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order (Re: Stipulation for partition)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Stella Beyder (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-24T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to Motion to Withdraw as Counsel; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Order Re: Motion to tax costs by plaintiff/cross-defendant Stella Beyder; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine Motion in Limine Supplement to Number 13; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2023-06-20T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2023-05-25T00:00:00Final Statement of Decision and Findings of Fact; Ruling on Objections; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2023-05-04T00:00:00Order Re: FSC/Trial Policies; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-29T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Proposed Order Appointing Referee; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-11T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order; Filed by: Stella Beyder (Plaintiff); As to: Stella Beyder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Janna Beyder, individually (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-20T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Stella Beyder (Cross-Defendant)
Date: October 16, 2023Statement of the Case; Filed by: Janna Beyder, individually (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-14T00:00:00Motion in Limine Number 11 to preclude reference to discovery order; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to Motion to Tax; Filed by: Eliza Beyder (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-04-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference Call re scheduling of MSC)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review (Re: MSC in B))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Trial) Filed by Janna Beyder, individually (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order (Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review (Re: MSC in M))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Answer Filed by Stella Beyder (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens Filed by Janna Beyder, individually (Plaintiff); Stella Beyder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Number 3) Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Number One to Preclude Settlement Discussions) Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review (Re: MSC in M))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Conference call re continuance of trial) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Janna Beyder, individually (Plaintiff); Stella Beyder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference Call re scheduling of MSC)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Janna Beyder, individually (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Janna Beyder, individually (Plaintiff); Stella Beyder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Provident Funding Associates, LP (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Status Report Filed by Janna Beyder, individually (Plaintiff); Stella Beyder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Answer (*AMENDED*) Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference /Trial Setting)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Brief (Settlement Conference Statement) Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Answer Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Janna Beyder, individually (Plaintiff); Stella Beyder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Janna Beyder, individually (Plaintiff); Stella Beyder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Janna Beyder, individually (Plaintiff); Stella Beyder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine (number seven re attorney elon berk) Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Reply (to plaintiff request for lodging of original transcript) Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Opposition (to Def's MIL 7) Filed by Janna Beyder, individually (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference Call (Re: Continuance of trial dates))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (Bifurcated-Previously Commenced))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-08T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Plaintiffs first motion in limine) Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (Previously Commenced))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (Bifurcated-Previously Commenced))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (Bifurcated))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Stella Beyder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (Bifurcated-Previously Commenced))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-13T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Janna Beyder, individually (Plaintiff); Stella Beyder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (Bifurcated-Previously Commenced))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Janna Beyder, individually (Plaintiff); Stella Beyder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (Bifurcated-Previously Commenced))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Eliza Beyder (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Objection (Objection to Janna Beyder Request for Judicial Notice) Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Request (for Lodging of Original Deposition Transcript) Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Number Six) Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (Bifurcated-Previously Commenced))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Remote Appearance) Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (Bifurcated- Previously Commenced))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Janna Beyder, individually (Plaintiff); Stella Beyder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (Previously Commenced))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (Previously Commenced))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Readiness Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (Bifurcated-Previously Commenced))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Acceptance of proposed referee) Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Final Statement of Decision and Findings of Fact; Ruling on Objections Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion to Withdraw as Counsel) Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Interlocutory Judgment for Partition) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (Bifurcated-Previously Commenced))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-11T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order) Filed by Janna Beyder, individually (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-20T00:00:00DEFENDANT/CROSS COMPLAINANT ELIZA BEYDER'S REPLY BRIEF Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-21T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Rescheduling Motions for Attorney Fees) Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Brief (Eliza Beyder Closing Brief) Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Notice (of filing motion for attorney fees) Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00Tentative Statement of Decision and Findings of Fact; Proposed Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Janna Beyder, individually (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing - Other on appointment of...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review (Re: Final Statement of Decision/E...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Eliza Beyder (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-08T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Mitchell Brian Ludwig (Attorney)
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Hearing) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Objection to Tentative Statement of Decision) Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order) Filed by Stella Beyder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Interlocutory Judgment for Partition Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Extend Deadline to File Mo...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review (Re: Closing briefs - Trial to st...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Number 11 to preclude reference to discovery order) Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00Brief (Settlement Conference Statement)
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Brief (Mandatory Settlement Conference)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference Call re scheduling of MSC))
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review (Re: MSC in M)))
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Conference Call re scheduling of MSC) of )
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference call re continuance of trial))
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of )
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review (Re: MSC in M)))
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review (Re: MSC in M)))
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses))
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Conference call re continuance of trial) of )
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference /Trial Setting))
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Answer (*AMENDED*)
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses))
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order (Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference)) of )
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses))
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Objection (PLAINTIFF'S (1) OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S COURT CALL APPEARANCE AT MSC AND (2) MSC BRIEF)
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Declaration (of Mitchell B. Ludwig re Fees and Costs)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint))
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review (Re: MSC in B)))
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review (Re: MSC in B)))
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (For Protective Order)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Summons (on cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review (Re: MSC in M)))
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion to Compel Further Responses)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Brief (Settlement Conference Statement)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Order (re Informal Disovery Conference)
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference Call re scheduling of MSC))
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint) of )
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Notice (of Plaintiff's Statement of Non Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order (Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference)))
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Declaration (of Mitchell B. Ludwig in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion in Limine)
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine (number four to preclude lay witnesses from offering expert medical opinion)
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Number 3)
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Fourth Motion in Limine)
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Objection (Objection to Janna Beyder Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Reply (to plaintiff request for lodging of original transcript)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Plaintiffs first motion in limine)
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (REGARDING DEFENDANT PROVIDENT FUNDING ASSOCIATES, LPS SECURITY INTEREST)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Motion in Limine Number 2 to Preclude Lay Witness Testimony on value of jewelry)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's First Motion in Limine)
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Number Six)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial))
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Fifth Motion in Limine)
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Second Motion in Limine)
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Number 5 re Janna Beyder retention of bankruptcy attorney)
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Motion in Limine (number 5 to permit questioning re attorney retention)
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Motion in Limine #1 to Limit Defendant's Expert Testimony)
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine (number seven re attorney elon berk)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Opposition (to Def's MIL 7)
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Request (for Lodging of Original Deposition Transcript)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Third Motion in Limine)
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Number One to Preclude Settlement Discussions)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Lenny Janner re Meet Confer on Motions in Limine)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial; Memorandum of Points and Authorities)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2022-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Remote Appearance)
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (Previously Commenced)))
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (Previously Commenced)))
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review (Re: MSC in M))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Conference Call re scheduling of MSC) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Janna Beyder, individually (Plaintiff); Stella Beyder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Janna Beyder, individually (Plaintiff); Stella Beyder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference call re continuance of trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Lenny Janner (Attorney)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion to Compel Further Responses) Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Summons (on cross-Complaint) Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review (Re: MSC in M))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Brief (Settlement Conference Statement) Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Janna Beyder, individually (Plaintiff); Stella Beyder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Janna Beyder, individually (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Filed by Janna Beyder, individually (Plaintiff); Stella Beyder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Shalem Shem-Tov (Attorney)
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (For Protective Order) Filed by Janna Beyder, individually (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL) Filed by Janna Beyder, individually (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order (Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference)) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review (Re: MSC in B))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial) Filed by Eliza Beyder (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Janna Beyder, individually (Plaintiff); Stella Beyder (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Order (re Informal Disovery Conference)
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 05/20/2020)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Conference Call re scheduling of MSC) of 07/02/2020)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference Call re scheduling of MSC))
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference Call re scheduling of MSC))
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Brief (Settlement Conference Statement)
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review (Re: MSC in M)))
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Objection (PLAINTIFF'S (1) OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S COURT CALL APPEARANCE AT MSC AND (2) MSC BRIEF)
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses))
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion to Compel Further Responses)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses))
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review (Re: MSC in M)))
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Summons (on cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice (of Plaintiff's Statement of Non Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint))
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (For Protective Order)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint) of 09/25/2020)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses))
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Declaration (of Mitchell B. Ludwig re Fees and Costs)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference call re continuance of trial))
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order (Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference)) of 09/07/2021)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Brief (Settlement Conference Statement)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review (Re: MSC in B)))
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Brief (Mandatory Settlement Conference)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order (Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference)))
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review (Re: MSC in M)))
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review (Re: MSC in M)))
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Conference call re continuance of trial) of 12/08/2020)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Answer (*AMENDED*)
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/03/2022)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial))
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial; Memorandum of Points and Authorities)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review (Re: MSC in B)))
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference /Trial Setting))
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.