Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Galindo Mickayleigh Aka Mickayleigh Slaughter, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys Courthouse East with Michael B. Harwin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael B. Harwin Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 08, 2019 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
|
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys Courthouse East |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time92 days |
Petition for Change of Name
Date: August 08, 2019Order on Court Fee Waiver FW-003 FW/APP-016
Date: August 08, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 08, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 08, 2019Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: August 08, 2019Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing (Superior Court)
Date: August 14, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FEE WAIVER HEARING)
Date: August 14, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)
Date: September 23, 2019Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name) - (AMENDED)
Date: September 24, 2019Proof of Publication
Date: November 05, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)
Date: November 08, 2019Decree Changing Name
Date: November 08, 2019Petition for Change of Name
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Fee Waiver Hearing))
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: September 24, 2019Proof of Publication
Date: November 05, 2019Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change))
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver FW-003 FW/APP-016
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Decree Changing Name
Date: November 08, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change))
Date: November 08, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.