Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Burton Anthony W., Rubanowitz Shalom, against 1565 Haslam Llc, Cardenas Alex Aka Alejandro Cardenas, Lw Asset Management Llc, Trejo Ruben, Wong Lee, (total of 7) See All represented by Bramzon Daniel J., Post Eric, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Thomas D. Long presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas D. Long Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management241 days |
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions403 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Order stipulation and order re discovery issues; Filed by:
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Anthony Burton; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Sandra Ann Will Carradine (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Declaration of Mitchell Willet in Support; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Declaration of Anthony Burton in Support; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Declaration of David Dutcher in Support; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Order Staying Execution of Judgment/Setting Hearing Date; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Order re Plaintiff's ex parte application; Filed by:
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Declaration of Danny Sandoval; Filed by: 1565 Haslam, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Claim of Right to Possession and Notice of Hearing]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgement; Filed by: Sandra Ann Will Carradine (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Order Ex Parte Worksheet ? Department 91; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Sandra Ann Will Carradine (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Declaration of Francisco Franco in Support; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Declaration of Gregory Wilson in Support; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Sandra Ann Will Carradine (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Order plaintiffs ex parte application for terminating sanctions; Filed by:
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Demurrer; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Declaration of Hamilton Barco in Support; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Opposition to demurrer; Filed by: Sandra Ann Will Carradine (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Amend Answer; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Order re ex parte application to advance demurrer to the amended answer; Filed by:
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Exhibit List Amended Joint; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Sandra Ann Will Carradine (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Order re motion to amend answer; Filed by:
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Order on plaintiff's motion in limine #3; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Order re Plaintiff's ex parte application; Filed by:
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Declaration IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Filed by: Sandra Ann Will Carradine (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Brief supplemental brief; Filed by: Sandra Ann Will Carradine (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Reply to opposition to motion for attorney fees; Filed by: Sandra Ann Will Carradine (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Sandra Ann Will Carradine (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued NOA B322747 INADEQUATE FUNDS; Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 13, 2022Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Sandra Ann Will Carradine (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Judgment - Unlawful Detainer) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Declaration of Daniel J. Bramzon in Response to OSC; Filed by: Sandra Ann Will Carradine (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Order - ORDER EX PARTE WORKSHEET – DEPARTMENT 91
Date: June 10, 2019Notice of Reclassification
Date: June 25, 2019Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: June 25, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 05, 2019Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: July 05, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 30, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: July 08, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 08, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: July 17, 2019Order - ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY ISSUES
Date: July 17, 2019Order - ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: July 31, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: August 01, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: August 08, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: August 22, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: September 24, 2019Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: August 29, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: August 29, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: August 30, 2019Order - ORDER PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS
Date: August 30, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 30, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: September 04, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: September 06, 2019Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: September 06, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: September 12, 2019Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: September 12, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE INFORMAL DISCOVERY...)
Date: September 12, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 17, 2019Case Management Order
Date: September 23, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 09/23/2019
Date: September 23, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: September 23, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING HEARING OFF CALENDAR
Date: September 27, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS)
Date: September 30, 2019Declaration of Alex Cardenas in Support; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Declaration of Peter de Witte in Support; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Declaration of Jeff Kirkpatrick in Support; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Reclassification; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Motion: Lee Wong; Filed by: Lee Wong (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 30, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: October 09, 2019Exhibit List
Date: October 16, 2019Notice - NOTICE JOINT STATEMENT OF RELIEF REQUESTED
Date: October 16, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2
Date: October 16, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: October 16, 2019Statement of the Case
Date: October 16, 2019Trial Brief
Date: October 16, 2019Witness List
Date: October 16, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3
Date: October 16, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 21, 2019Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: October 21, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANNY SANDOVAL
Date: October 23, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALEXANDER G. STEWART IN SUPPORT
Date: October 24, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF GREGORY WILSON IN SUPPORT
Date: October 24, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEFF KIRKPATRICK IN SUPPORT
Date: October 24, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF FRANCISCO FRANCO IN SUPPORT
Date: October 24, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID DUTCHER IN SUPPORT
Date: October 24, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANTHONY BURTON IN SUPPORT
Date: October 24, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER POWELL IN SUPPORT
Date: October 24, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALEX CARDENAS IN SUPPORT
Date: October 24, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF PETER DE WITTE IN SUPPORT
Date: October 24, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF HAMILTON BARCO IN SUPPORT
Date: October 24, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF JAMES A. BECKSTROM II IN SUPPORT
Date: October 24, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: October 24, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 24, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 24, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF KAREN BUSTA FLORES IN SUPPORT
Date: October 24, 2019Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST AMENDED JOINT
Date: October 25, 2019Order - ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: October 28, 2019Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON PLTFS EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: October 28, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: October 29, 2019Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: October 31, 2019Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLTFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: November 01, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 04, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 04, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 05, 2019Order - ORDER RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: November 06, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; TRIAL SETTING CONFERE...)
Date: November 06, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: November 13, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 18, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: November 18, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE /FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: December 19, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: December 30, 2019Status Report
Date: January 06, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE RE ADVANCE HEARING DATE
Date: January 30, 2020Status Report
Date: January 31, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 18, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO AMEND ANSWER
Date: February 18, 2020Order - ORDER RE MOTION TO AMEND ANSWER
Date: February 19, 2020Answer
Date: February 21, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER AMEND THE ANSWER; STATUS CONFERENCE...)
Date: February 19, 2020Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: February 28, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 28, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 02, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: March 02, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF HALL IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MSJ
Date: March 02, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION RE EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: March 03, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: March 09, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/19/2020
Date: March 19, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 20, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/20/2020
Date: March 20, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: March 23, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/01/2020
Date: April 01, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: April 08, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 01, 2020RETURNED MAIL
Date: April 09, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/14/2020
Date: April 14, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF E SERVICE CONSENT
Date: April 13, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 14, 2020Response - RESPONSE TO OBJECTION TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: June 19, 2020Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: June 19, 2020Order - ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S DEMURRER TO ANSWER
Date: June 29, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: June 29, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE TRIAL BINDERS)
Date: September 04, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: September 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: December 04, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE LODGE TRIAL BINDERS)
Date: April 02, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: April 09, 2021Order - ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE #3
Date: April 21, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: LODGE TRIAL BINDERS)
Date: April 20, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 21, 2021Order - ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE #1
Date: April 21, 2021Order - ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE #2
Date: April 21, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/21/2021
Date: April 21, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: April 22, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 03, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: May 03, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: May 03, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 03, 2021Separate Statement
Date: May 03, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 06, 2021Order - ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION ADVANCING HEARING ON MSJ
Date: May 10, 2021Exhibit List
Date: May 10, 2021Jury Question - JURY QUESTION PLAINTIFF’S PROPOSED JURY QUESTIONNAIRE
Date: May 10, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 10, 2021Trial Brief
Date: May 10, 2021Witness List
Date: May 10, 2021Statement of the Case
Date: May 10, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL J. BRAMZON IN RESPONSE TO OSC
Date: May 12, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 17, 2021Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MSJ
Date: May 20, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 20, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING:)
Date: June 08, 2021Brief - BRIEF TO THE COURT REGARDING AMENDMENT OF ANSWER
Date: June 11, 2021Reply - REPLY TO SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: June 16, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 16, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MSJ AND EXHIBITS
Date: July 12, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: July 12, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 12, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 12, 2021Separate Statement
Date: July 12, 2021Order - ORDER RE: DEFENDANT CARRADINE'S MOTION' FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: July 12, 2021Answer
Date: July 12, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: July 12, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 14, 2021Order - ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: July 19, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 26, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 27, 2021Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MSJ
Date: August 27, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: September 13, 2021Order - ORDER RE: DEFENDANT CARRADINE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: September 13, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 13, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: September 28, 2021Judgment - Unlawful Detainer
Date: September 28, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER)
Date: September 28, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF 09/28/2021
Date: September 28, 2021Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: October 12, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 29, 2021Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: November 29, 2021Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: November 29, 2021Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: December 15, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 20, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: January 20, 2022Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: February 14, 2022Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: February 28, 2022Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 02, 2022Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: March 02, 2022Request For Copies
Date: March 10, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES
Date: April 06, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 08, 2022Request For Copies
Date: April 07, 2022Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES
Date: April 08, 2022Request For Copies
Date: April 12, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES)
Date: April 18, 2022Brief - BRIEF SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF
Date: April 28, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 28, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 28, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 31, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 01, 2022Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANT’S WRITTEN OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE.
Date: June 01, 2022Order re ex parte appliction to advance hearing; Filed by:
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Opposition re ex parte application; Filed by: Sandra Ann Will Carradine (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Sandra Ann Will Carradine (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Notice Joint Statement of Relief Requested; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Reply TO OPPOSITION TO MSJ; Filed by: Sandra Ann Will Carradine (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Order re: Defendant Carradine's Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by:
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Request For Copies; Filed by: Sandra Ann Will Carradine (Respondent)
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Request For Copies; Filed by: Sandra Ann Will Carradine (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Sandra Ann Will Carradine (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by:
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Objection DEFENDANT’S WRITTEN OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE. Filed by: Sandra Ann Will Carradine (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Sandra Ann Will Carradine (Appellant)
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Order re: Ex Parte Application Advancing Hearing on MSJ; Filed by: Sandra Ann Will Carradine (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Sandra Ann Will Carradine (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Declaration in support of MSJ and exhibits; Filed by: Sandra Ann Will Carradine (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcripts Deposit Paid Paid for Sandra Carradine; Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 15, 2022Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Sandra Ann Will Carradine (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued "U"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (COURT ORDER REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING:) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Order on plaintiff's motion in limine #2; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Request For Copies; Filed by: Sandra Ann Will Carradine (Respondent)
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Sandra Ann Will Carradine (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed B317957; Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 14, 2023Separate Statement; Filed by: Sandra Ann Will Carradine (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Opposition to Motion for Attorney's Fees; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Order Re: Defendant Carradine's Motion' for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Sandra Ann Will Carradine (Defendant)
Date: October 16, 2023Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal NOA U; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript NOA B322474; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Sandra Ann Will Carradine (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcripts; Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 09, 2023Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Sandra Ann Will Carradine (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Order re Plaintiff's demurrer to answer; Filed by:
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Reply to opposition to MSJ; Filed by: Sandra Ann Will Carradine (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: June 06, 2022Unknown - REQUEST FOR COURT REPORTER SERVICES BY PARTY WITH FEE WAIVER
Date: June 07, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 07, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 22, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES)
Date: June 30, 2022Order - ORDER OF 7/28/22
Date: July 28, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 08, 2022Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: September 08, 2022Appeal - Notice of Default Issued - APPEAL - NOTICE OF DEFAULT ISSUED "U"
Date: October 21, 2022Stipulation and Order (on plaintiff's ex parte application)
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Reclassification
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO RECLASSIFY CASE
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((1565 Haslam, LLC))
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2019-07-05T00:00:00Application for Writ of Possession
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Writ of Execution
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Hearing Off Calendar)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Ruben Trejo))
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION (ARRIETA) AS TO SANDR...))
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions (or, Alternatively, to Compel the Deposition of Sandra Carradine)
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Request (Plaintiff's Request to Set Aside Default of Defendant Lee Wong)
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Posting
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of )
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Declaration (In Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Advance Informal Discovery Conference)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Alex Cardenas))
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Order (on plaintiff's motion in limine #3)
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Advance Hearing on Demurrer to Amended Answer)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Order (on plaintiff's motion in limine #2)
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Declaration (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Declaration (of Daniel J. Bramzon in Response to OSC)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Order (re: Ex Parte Application Advancing Hearing on MSJ)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING:) of )
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO SET HEARING FOR MOTION FOR...))
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Defendant's brief ; Non-Appearance...))
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Reply (TO OPPOSITION TO MSJ)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Reply (TO SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER - REGARDING: SETTING A STATUS CONFERENCE ON JUNE ...))
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER - REGARDING: SETTING A STATUS CONFERENCE ON JUNE ...) of )
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING:))
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Brief (to the Court regarding Amendment of Answer)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Declaration (in support of MSJ and exhibits)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Lodging of Compilation of Movi...))
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Final Status Conferen...))
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Order (on ex parte application)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Order (Re: Defendant Carradine's Motion' for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Final Status Conferen...))
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Attorney's Fees)
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Reply (to opposition to MSJ)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Reply (to opposition to motion for attorney fees)
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Request For Copies
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Judgment - Unlawful Detainer))
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Judgment - Unlawful Detainer
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Judgment - Unlawful Detainer) of )
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Request For Copies
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Alex Cardenas))
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((1565 Haslam, LLC))
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((LW Asset Management, LLC))
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS))
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Ruben Trejo))
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Lee Wong))
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION (ARRIETA) AS TO SANDR...))
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Claim of Right to Possession and Notice of Hearing])
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION (ARRIETA) AS TO SANDR...))
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Request (Plaintiff's Request to Set Aside Default of Defendant Lee Wong)
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Anthony Burton)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Order (Ex Parte Worksheet ? Department 91)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Advance Hearing on Discovery Motions)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Advance Hearin...))
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FO...))
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Order (proposed order)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Set and Advance Hearing on...))
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Set and Advance Hearing on Pending Discovery Motions)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Set and Advance Hearing on...))
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Declaration (opposition to plaintiff's ex parte application by Raymond Barajas)
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Lee Wong's failure to appear at the I...))
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Compel Deposition of Defen...))
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Order re motion for summary judgment; Filed by:
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Order on plaintiff's motion in limine #1; Filed by: De Witte Mortgage Investors Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: January 10, 2020Answer - ANSWER AMENDED
Date: January 24, 2020Motion re: - MOTION RE: TO AMEND THE ANSWER
Date: January 24, 2020Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING THE TIME
Date: January 24, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF JONATHAN SEGURA RE: PROFFER OF STIPULATED FACTS
Date: January 28, 2020Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Lee Wong's failure to follow the Cour...))
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions (or, Alternatively, to Compel the Deposition of Sandra Carradine)
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion)
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance HEaring on Pending...))
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Declaration (In Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Advance Informal Discovery Conference)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance Informal Discovery...))
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant's opposition to ex parte application)
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (on plaintiff's ex parte application)
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 09/23/2019)
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/20/2020)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Declaration (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Separate Statement (PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF RELIEF REQUESTED)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to set hearing on MSJ to earlier date)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Jury Question (PLAINTIFF?S PROPOSED JURY QUESTIONNAIRE)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Set Hearing on MSJ to Earl...))
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Order (re: Ex Parte Application Advancing Hearing on MSJ)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Trial Setting Conference; Jury Trial...))
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Declaration (of Daniel J. Bramzon in Response to OSC)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Reply (TO OPPOSITION TO MSJ)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Lodging of Compilation of Movi...))
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Final Status Conferen...))
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING:))
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING:) of 06/08/2021)
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER - REGARDING: SETTING A STATUS CONFERENCE ON JUNE ...))
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Brief (to the Court regarding Amendment of Answer)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Final Status Conferen...))
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Reply (TO SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Defendant's brief ; Non-Appearance...))
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Declaration (in support of MSJ and exhibits)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Order (Re: Defendant Carradine's Motion' for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Order (on ex parte application)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO SET HEARING FOR MOTION FOR...))
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Reply (to opposition to MSJ)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Motion: Lee Wong
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Hearing Off Calendar)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions))
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference re case management to discuss the W...))
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 2)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Notice (Joint Statement of Relief Requested)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Danny Sandoval)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Gregory Wilson in Support)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Christopher Powell in Support)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Alexander G. Stewart in Support)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Alex Cardenas in Support)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Francisco Franco in Support)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Mitchell Willet in Support)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Karen Busta Flores in Support)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Declaration (of David Dutcher in Support)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Anthony Burton in Support)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Peter de Witte in Support)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Jeff Kirkpatrick in Support)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((LW Asset Management, LLC))
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Lee Wong))
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Order (Ex Parte Worksheet ? Department 91)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Compel Deposition of Defen...))
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS))
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Order Staying Execution of Judgment/Setting Hearing Date
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion)
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Set and Advance Hearing on...))
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Advance Hearing on Discovery Motions)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance HEaring on Pending...))
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Advance Informal Discovery Conference Reserved for November 7, 2019)
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-05T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant's opposition to ex parte application)
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION (ARRIETA) AS TO SANDRA ANN WILL CARRADINE
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Lee Wong's failure to follow the Cour...))
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Order (proposed order)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT LEE WONG AND REQUEST OF SANCTIONS
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Anthony Burton)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance Informal Discovery...))
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re trial binders))
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FO...))
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Declaration (of James A. Beckstrom II in Support)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Set and Advance Hearing on Pending Discovery Motions)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Lee Wong's failure to appear at the I...))
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application to R...))
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Advance Hearin...))
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Declaration (of Christopher Powell in Support)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Claim of Right to Possession and Notice of Hearing])
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION (ARRIETA) AS TO SANDR...))
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Mitchell Willet in Support)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Jury Question (PLAINTIFF?S PROPOSED JURY QUESTIONNAIRE)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Response (to Objection to Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Trial Setting Conference; Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Peter de Witte in Support)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an order shortening the time)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference /Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions))
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (on Pltfs Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration Of Burton In Support Of Opposition To Motion For Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Opposition (to ex parte re advance hearing date)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Danny Sandoval)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Amend the Answer; Status Conference...))
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgement)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Francisco Franco in Support)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Order (on plaintiff's motion in limine #1)
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion - Other Amend the Answer; Status Conference...) of )
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application to R...))
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Answer (Amended)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference re case management to discuss the W...))
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Advance Hearing on Demurrer t...))
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Notice (Joint Statement of Relief Requested)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of David Rindenow in Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Exhibit List (in Support of Opposition to Pltfs Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Exhibit List (Amended Joint)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Declaration (of Hamilton Barco in Support)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition To Motion For Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Declaration (of Alex Cardenas in Support)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Trial Setting Conference; Jury Trial...))
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Declaration (of Anthony Burton in Support)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration Of Hall In Support Of Opposition To MSJ)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Opposition (to demurrer)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Declaration (of Alexander G. Stewart in Support)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Karen Busta Flores in Support)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 3)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Declaration (of David Dutcher in Support)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Opposition (re ex parte application)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Notice ( of E service consent)
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Motion re: (to Amend the Answer)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Demurrer)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Trial Setting Confere...))
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Jeff Kirkpatrick in Support)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Amend Answer)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Declaration (of Gregory Wilson in Support)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)])
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Declaration (of Jonathan Segura re: Proffer of Stipulated Facts)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Separate Statement (PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF RELIEF REQUESTED)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to set hearing on MSJ to earlier date)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order shortening the time))
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 2)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration Of De Witte In Support Of Opposition To Motion For Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Set Hearing on MSJ to Earl...))
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re lodge trial binders))
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (on Pltfs Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application to R...))
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Exhibit List (in Support of Opposition to Pltfs Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgement)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of David Rindenow in Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Trial Setting Confere...))
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference /Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an order shortening the time)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order shortening the time))
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Jonathan Segura re: Proffer of Stipulated Facts)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Opposition (to ex parte re advance hearing date)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration Of De Witte In Support Of Opposition To Motion For Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration Of Hall In Support Of Opposition To MSJ)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition To Motion For Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Opposition (re ex parte application)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration Of Burton In Support Of Opposition To Motion For Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Advance Hearing on Demurrer t...))
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Opposition (to demurrer)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/01/2020)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/14/2020)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Notice ( of E service consent)
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Demurrer)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Response (to Objection to Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re trial binders))
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re lodge trial binders))
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Trial Setting Conference; Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Order (on plaintiff's motion in limine #1)
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/21/2021)
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Order (on plaintiff's motion in limine #2)
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Order (on plaintiff's motion in limine #3)
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Application for Order to Post
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Set and Advance Hearing on...))
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Declaration (opposition to plaintiff's ex parte application by Raymond Barajas)
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Advance Informal Discovery Conference Reserved for November 7, 2019)
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 3)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application to R...))
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Hamilton Barco in Support)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Declaration (of James A. Beckstrom II in Support)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Exhibit List (Amended Joint)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Motion re: (to Amend the Answer)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Answer (Amended)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Amend Answer)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Amend the Answer; Status Conference...))
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Advance Hearing on Demurrer to Amended Answer)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)])
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.