Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Betsill Trudee, Bleck Maureen, Buxton Robert, Cook Danny, Cook Debra A., (total of 32) See All filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case represented by Pearson Robert Edward, Watson Richard Cooper Iii, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Barbara R. Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarbara R. Johnson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 15, 2019 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2024 | Hearing |
Probate Department 11 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report |
|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Assignment (Agreement and Assignment From Robert Buxton ) Filed by Assignee |
|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037) Filed by Assignee |
|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order (Determining Entitlement to Estate Distribution ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 11, Rosenbloom, Jonathan L, Presiding Probate Code 850 Hearing - Held Probate Code 850 Hearing - Held Judge: Rosenbloom Jonathan L |
|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition Granted | |
March 09, 2023 | Hearing |
Probate Department 11 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Probate Code 850 Hearing |
|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Claimant |
|
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order (Approving Third Status Report ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.