Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Daniel Powers Md. Inc. Dba Discovery Diagnostics Inc. A Corporation, Southwest Law Center, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lopez Anthony R. Jr., Smith L. Dean Jr., against Accident Center, Discovery Diagnostics Inc., Discovery Diagnostics Inc. Dba Discovery Diagnostics Inc., Miramontes Lucero, Daniel Powers Md. Inc. Dba Discovery Diagnostics Inc. A Corporation, (total of 5) See All represented by Goldstein Neal Mark, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Yolanda Orozco presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYolanda Orozco Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management477 days |
Filing DateJune 26, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Opposition (to Ex Parte Application to Continue FSC and Trial)
Date: January 27, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: August 19, 2020Notice of Reclassification
Date: August 19, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SOUTHWEST LAW CENTER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: SOUTHWEST LAW CENTER (Plaintiff); Service Cost Waived: No
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES; Filed by: DISCOVERY DIAGNOSTICS, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal B311840, NA;; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to Ex Parte Application; Filed by: DISCOVERY DIAGNOSTICS, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed B311840; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: SOUTHWEST LAW CENTER (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Request REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; Filed by: SOUTHWEST LAW CENTER (Plaintiff); Charge Fee ?: YES
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL RECLASS/REASSIGN NOTICES; Filed by: Clerk; As to: DISCOVERY DIAGNOSTICS, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Daniel Powers, MD., Inc., (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Reply IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRERS; Filed by: DISCOVERY DIAGNOSTICS, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Daniel Powers, MD., Inc., (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: DISCOVERY DIAGNOSTICS, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Opposition TO MOTION TO STRIKE; Filed by: Daniel Powers, MD., Inc., (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Reply Reply in Support of Demurrers; Filed by: Daniel Powers, MD., Inc., (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: SOUTHWEST LAW CENTER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: DISCOVERY DIAGNOSTICS, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Opposition TO DEMURRER SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; Filed by: SOUTHWEST LAW CENTER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Reclassification; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Declaration OF THEODORE COX REGARDING NOTICE OF EX PARTE; Filed by: SOUTHWEST LAW CENTER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: SOUTHWEST LAW CENTER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal B311840; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Default entered as to LUCERO MIRAMONTES; On the Amended Complaint (2nd) filed by SOUTHWEST LAW CENTER on
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Request (REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Reply (Reply in Support of Demurrers -[Res ID: 7532])
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Summons (on Amended Complaint (1st))
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (on Demurrers)
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (to Second Amended Complaint -[Res ID: 1369])
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Answer (to Cross-Complaint: Discovery Diagnostics, Inc.)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Amended Complaint (2nd)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES -[Res ID: _8681]
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement (of Daniel Powers M D Inc)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEMURRER SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT -[Hrg: ])
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer) of )
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Proof of Service of (Second Amended) Summons (by personal service)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Reply (TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION T STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES -[Hrg: ])
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement (of Plaintiff / Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees (by Plaintiff / Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON DEFENDANT?S DEMURRERS TO COMPLAINT SECOND AMENDED AND PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Proof of Service of (Second Amended) Summons (by substituted service and proof of mailing)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND CASE REASSIGNMENT)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Proof of Service of (Second Amended) Summons (by substituted service and proof of mailing)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer))
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Strike Punitive Damages) -[Hrg: ])
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurr...))
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Reclassification
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRERS -[Hrg: ])
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES -[Res ID: _8681])
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (by Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Declaration (OF THEODORE COX REGARDING NOTICE OF EX PARTE)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL RECLASS/REASSIGN NOTICES
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B311840)
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order)
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DISCOVERY DIAGNOSTICS, INC.
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte Application to Continue FSC and Trial)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Settlement) of )
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (- NOT ENTERED )
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application REQUESTING THE COURT SIGN THE...))
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal ( B311840)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for An Order Continuing Febru...))
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (B311840, NA;)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00AMENDED Proof Of Substituted Service Of Summons (on Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing the J...))
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order))
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE FSC and TRIAL)
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: August 05, 2022Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Settlement))
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (as to Cross-Complaint filed by Daniel Powers MD Inc on )
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2022-05-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Answer (to Cross-Complaint: Discovery Diagnostics, Inc.)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Reply (TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION T STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES -[Hrg: ])
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees (by Plaintiff / Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement (of Plaintiff / Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (by Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Proof of Service of (Second Amended) Summons (by personal service)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND CASE REASSIGNMENT)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DISCOVERY DIAGNOSTICS, INC.
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order)
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Request (REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Answer (to Cross-Complaint: Discovery Diagnostics, Inc.)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Reply (Reply in Support of Demurrers -[Res ID: 7532])
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Amended Complaint (2nd)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Summons (on Amended Complaint (1st))
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (on Demurrers)
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Strike Punitive Damages) -[Hrg: 07/23/2020])
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Reply (TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION T STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES -[Hrg: 08/12/2020])
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (to Second Amended Complaint -[Res ID: 1369])
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Proof of Service of (Second Amended) Summons (by personal service)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer))
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/20/2020)
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND CASE REASSIGNMENT)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement (of Plaintiff / Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement (of Daniel Powers M D Inc)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees (by Plaintiff / Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (by Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Proof of Service of (Second Amended) Summons (by substituted service and proof of mailing)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES -[Res ID: _8681])
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRERS -[Hrg: 01/19/2021])
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES -[Res ID: _8681]
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEMURRER SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT -[Hrg: 01/19/2021])
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Proof of Service of (Second Amended) Summons (by substituted service and proof of mailing)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurr...))
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON DEFENDANT?S DEMURRERS TO COMPLAINT SECOND AMENDED AND PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Declaration (OF THEODORE COX REGARDING NOTICE OF EX PARTE)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DISCOVERY DIAGNOSTICS, INC.
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application REQUESTING THE COURT SIGN THE...))
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal (3/16/21 B311840)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/01/2021)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (B311840, NA03/16/21;)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order)
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE FSC and TRIAL)
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing the J...))
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order))
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B311840)
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement ((P / X-D))
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees ((P / X-D))
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement ((X-C))
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Anthony Lopez)
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Theodore Cox)
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES -[Res ID: _8681]
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (to Second Amended Complaint -[Res ID: 1369])
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRERS -[Hrg: 01/19/2021])
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.