Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Burrell Tonya, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Agu Kenechi Reuben, against Brookshire Resources Inc., Gonzalez Jose Morales, Patriot Motor Works Inc. Dba Blue Lake Auto Glass, represented by Carranza Jessica E, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Daniel M. Crowley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel M. Crowley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 07, 2019 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing for Secretary of State re: Patriot; Filed by:
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Setting Status Confernce) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Brookshire Resources, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Reclassification; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Brookshire Resources, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Tonya Burrell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Brookshire Resources, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Reclassification
Date: July 21, 2020Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: July 17, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: July 21, 2020Answer
Date: October 09, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERNCE)
Date: November 12, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: December 11, 2020Notice of Reclassification Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Tonya Burrell (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Tonya Burrell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Order (for Secretary of State re BROOKSHIRE) Filed by Tonya Burrell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Tonya Burrell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Setting Status Confernce) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Tonya Burrell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Setting Status Confernce)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Tonya Burrell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Order (for Secretary of State re: Patriot) Filed by Tonya Burrell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Tonya Burrell (Plaintiff)
Date: April 30, 2021Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Tonya Burrell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Order (for Secretary of State re: Patriot)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Setting Status Confernce))
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Order (for Secretary of State re BROOKSHIRE)
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Setting Status Confernce) of 11/12/2020)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Reclassification
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.