Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
People'S Union Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Shaker David, against T-Mobile West Llc, represented by Kuhn Bradford B, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with James E. Blancarte presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames E. Blancarte Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 22, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Amended Complaint 1st; Filed by: People's Union LLC (Plaintiff); As to: T-Mobile West LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Notice (of Limited Scope Representation)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) ((JUDGE TERRY A. GREEN))
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion)))
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Amended Complaint 1st
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Amended Complaint (First)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Reply (RE; MOTION TO RECLASSIFY CASE TO UNLIMITED; DECLARATION OF FORMER COUNSEL)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Reclassification
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: People's Union LLC (Plaintiff); As to: T-Mobile West LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Motion to Reclassify; Filed by: People's Union LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: People's Union LLC (Plaintiff); As to: T-Mobile West LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: T-Mobile West LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Amended Complaint First; Filed by: People's Union LLC (Plaintiff); As to: T-Mobile West LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Reclassification; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: People's Union LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: T-Mobile West LLC (Defendant); As to: People's Union LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: People's Union LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: T-Mobile West LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: People's Union LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation; Filed by: People's Union LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Motion to Reclassify
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/21/2020)
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.