Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Rivera Ruben, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Christensen Roland, Christensen Roland Thomas Esq., against Apl Marine Services Ltd., represented by Port Andrew I., Port Andrew Ira Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Serena R. Murillo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSerena R. Murillo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2019 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Ruben Rivera (Plaintiff); As to: APL Marine Services, Ltd. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ruben Rivera (Plaintiff); As to: APL Marine Services, Ltd. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: APL Marine Services, Ltd. (Defendant); As to: Ruben Rivera (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice Notice of Hearing; Filed by: Ruben Rivera (Plaintiff); As to: Ruben Rivera (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date; Filed by: APL Marine Services, Ltd. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: APL Marine Services, Ltd. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: APL Marine Services, Ltd. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Ruben Rivera (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Ruben Rivera (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Ruben Rivera (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Ruben Rivera (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Answer Filed by APL Marine Services, Ltd. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Admitting Micajah D. Boatright, ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Ruben Rivera (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Hearing) Filed by Ruben Rivera (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Ruben Rivera (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL) Filed by APL Marine Services, Ltd. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by APL Marine Services, Ltd. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed by APL Marine Services, Ltd. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for and Order Admitting Joseph F. McGowin, ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Hearing)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for and Order Admitting Joseph F. McGowin, ...))
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date (AND STIPULATED MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Admitting Micajah D. Boatright, ...))
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Order (ON DEFENDANT APL MARINE SERVICES, LTD.'S STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Hearing)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for and Order Admitting Joseph F. McGowin, ...))
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Admitting Micajah D. Boatright, ...))
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/25/2021)
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Order (ON DEFENDANT APL MARINE SERVICES, LTD.'S STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date (AND STIPULATED MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2022 | Hearing |
Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Judge: Serena R. Murillo |
|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Serena R. Murillo |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Serena R. Murillo |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Serena R. Murillo |
|
April 19, 2022 | Hearing |
Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Conference / Case Review Re: Pro Hac Vice Status of Attorney Micajah D. Boatright (Payment of $500.00 Renewal Fee) Judge: Serena R. Murillo |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding Conference (/ Case Review Re Pro Hac Vice Status of Attorney Micajah D. Boatright (Payment of $500.00 Renewal Fee)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Conference (/ Case Review Re Pro Hac Vice Status of Attorney Micajah D. Boatright (Payment of $500.00 Renewal Fee)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Serena R. Murillo |
|
April 19, 2022 | Hearing |
in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding Conference (/ Case Review Re Pro Hac Vice Status of Attorney Micajah D. Boatright (Payment of $500.00 Renewal Fee)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Serena R. Murillo |
|
January 05, 2022 | Hearing |
Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Conference / Case Review Re: Pro Hac Vice Status of Attorney Joseph F. McGowin ($500.00 Renewal Fees Payment) Judge: Serena R. Murillo |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding Conference (/ Case Review Re Pro Hac Vice Status of Attorney Joseph F. McGowin ($500.00 Renewal Fees Payment)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Conference (/ Case Review Re Pro Hac Vice Status of Attorney Joseph F. McGowin ($500.00 Renewal Fees Payment)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Serena R. Murillo |
|
January 05, 2022 | Hearing |
in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding Conference (/ Case Review Re Pro Hac Vice Status of Attorney Joseph F. McGowin ($500.00 Renewal Fees Payment)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Serena R. Murillo |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.