Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Banuelos Laura, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Alder Michael, against Lyft Inc., Steadfast Insurance Company, York Risk Services Inc., represented by Haas Todd Richard, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Thomas D. Long presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas D. Long Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 13, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 13, 2019Petition - PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: December 13, 2019Petition (to Compel Arbitration) Filed by Laura Banuelos (Petitioner) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Motion of Petition to Compel Arbitration) Filed by Laura Banuelos (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Laura Banuelos (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration Filed by Laura Banuelos (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Motion of Petition to Compel Arbitration) Filed by Laura Banuelos (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Laura Banuelos (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Motion of Petition to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Petition (to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration))
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Motion of Petition to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.