Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Burhans Stephen, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Berry Leah, against Costco Wholesale Corporation, represented by Miretsky Michael, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Huey P. Cotton, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHuey P. Cotton, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 08, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Separate Statement; Filed by: Costco Wholesale Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Stephen Burhans (Plaintiff); As to: Costco Wholesale Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Costco Wholesale Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Motion to Reclassify; Filed by: Costco Wholesale Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: Costco Wholesale Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Costco Wholesale Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Costco Wholesale Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by: Stephen Burhans (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Stephen Burhans (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Post-Mediation Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Costco Wholesale Corporation (Defendant); As to: Stephen Burhans (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SAN...)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to Independent Calendar Court))
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/20/2020)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Deposition of Leandro Portella)
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 09/03/2020)
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: COVID-19))
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Deposition of Costco Employee Jelina Burris)
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Transferring Personal Injury (PI) Case to Ind...))
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: COVID-19) of 04/14/2020)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Order (Transferring Personal Injury (PI) Case to Independent Calendar (IC) Court)
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Admissions)
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment to Independent Calendar Court) of 08/12/2020)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses))
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Setting of Motion Pursuant to Emergency Order ...))
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion)))
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Reply (Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Def's Motion for Reclassification)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: San...))
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Post-Mediation Status Conference) of 02/18/2021)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC); Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference))
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Brief (Defendant Costco's Mandatory Settlement Conference Brief)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel DEPOSITION OF COSTCO EMPLOYEE ROB...))
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Order ((PROPOSED) ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF COSTCO EMPLOYEE ROBERT HOLDEN)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Motion to Reclassify
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Compel Deposition of Costc...))
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Compel Deposition of Costco Employee)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Stephen Burhans (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: COVID-19) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Stephen Burhans (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Stephen Burhans (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.