Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Douglas Forbes Individually And As Successor-In-Interest To Roxie Mirabelle Forbes, Elena Matyas Individually And As Successor-In- Interest To Roxie Mirabelle Forbes, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Alfaro Meylin Patricia, Davidson Laura Lynn, George Victor L., George Victor Light, Yektafar Talia, (total of 5) See All against American National Red Cross Aka American Red Cross, Angelus Mountain Center Entity Type Unknown, Cervantes An Individual Andrew Lara, Dimassa An Individual Cara, Dimassa An Individual Giancarlo Md, (total of 20) See All represented by Bergsten Robert, Campo Mary Michele, Holm Esq Margaret M, Holm Margaret Manton, Rosenberg Sheryl M., (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Audra M. Mori presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAudra M. Mori Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 05, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions100 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: JOSEPH DIMASSA, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: JAIMI HARRISON, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: SUMMERKIDS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: SUMMERKIDS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: ANDREW LARA CERVANTES, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: ANDREW LARA CERVANTES, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: SUMMERKIDS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: JAIMI HARRISON, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: JAIMI HARRISON, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: JAIMI HARRISON, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: DANIEL H. RAINEY, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: As to: SEMPRE AVANTI, LLC, and California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: SUMMERKIDS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: SUMMERKIDS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: MARIA DIMASSA, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: JOSEPH DIMASSA, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: SUMMERKIDS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: GIANCARLO DIMASSA, an individual, MD (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: THE ENOTECA, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: THE DIMASSA FAMILY FOUNDATION, a 501(c)(3) corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Declaration (Of Sheryl Rosenberg Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 435.5)
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Declaration (Pursuant To Code Of Of Civil Procedure)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Order (Transferring Complicated Personal Injury (PI) Case to an Independent Calendar (IC) Court)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Reply (Reply Brief in support of Motion to Strike)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer))
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review - Court Order setting a Status Con...))
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Court Order Advancing Continuing C...))
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Court Order Continuing Civil, Tria...))
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00Notice (of New Date for the Hearing)
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review - COURT ORDER ADVANCING AND CONTIN...))
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Deposition of Defendant Faith Porter)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANT JOSEPH NATALIZIO'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Port...))
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurr...))
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice (OF TAKING DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY DEFENDANT DIMASSA FAMILY TRUST OFF CALENDAR)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Mary M. Campo Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure ¿ 435.5)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Complicated ?PI? Case Transferred from ...))
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition To Motion To Compel Deposition)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Status Conference Re Second Amended...))
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Second Amended Complaint and Demurrer/Mo...))
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Second Amended Complaint and Demurrer/Mo...))
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint ...))
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (1st))
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO DEFENDANTS? OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF MARGARET M. HOLM, ESQ., PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 430.41, 435.5)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiffs' Notice of Association of Counsel)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Notice (to State Court and to Adverse Parties of Removal to Federal Court)
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re Mediation and Discovery))
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: SUMMERKIDS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: JAIMI HARRISON, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: ANDREW LARA CERVANTES, an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: SUMMERKIDS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00in Department D
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Modify Subpoena, Protective Order ...))
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00in Department D
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00in Department D
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00in Department D
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Subpoena of Records from City of A...))
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00in Department D
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Remand))
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (Motion for leave to amend first amended complaint)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.