Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Stosser Miriam, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Chivinski Andrew, against Atria Santa Clarita A California Business Entity Form Unknown, Atria Senior Living Inc. A California Corporation, represented by Nowotny George E, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Mark A. Borenstein presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark A. Borenstein Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management114 days |
Filing DateNovember 04, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions294 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Miriam Stosser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Miriam Stosser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Miriam Stosser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Atria Senior Living, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Declaration re: OSC; Filed by: Miriam Stosser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Miriam Stosser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Motion for Trial Preference; Filed by: Miriam Stosser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Miriam Stosser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Miriam Stosser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Reply Memo of P&A Motion for Preference; Filed by: Miriam Stosser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Miriam Stosser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Miriam Stosser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Motion for Trial Preference Filed by Miriam Stosser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Miriam Stosser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Firs...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Miriam Stosser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Amended Complaint Filed by Miriam Stosser (Plaintiff); Miriam Stosser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Declaration (re: OSC) Filed by Miriam Stosser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Miriam Stosser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Transfer And Reassignment Of Complicated Pers...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment) Filed by Miriam Stosser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Miriam Stosser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference; Case Management Confe...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Miriam Stosser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Reply (Memo of P&A Motion for Preference) Filed by Miriam Stosser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Miriam Stosser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Miriam Stosser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Atria Senior Living, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Transfer And Reassignment Of Complicated Pers...))
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Notice ( Of Taking Off Calendar)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Motion for Trial Preference
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Court Order Re: Transfer of Complicated Personal Injury Case to Independent Calendar Court
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Opposition (DEFENDANTS? OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Declaration (re: OSC)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Reply (Memo of P&A Motion for Preference)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference; Case Management Confe...))
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Firs...))
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.