Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Camper James, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against St. Mark Private Security Inc., Safros Corporation, represented by Gerges Motaz, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Holly E. Kendig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHolly E. Kendig Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 04, 2019 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Cycle Time112 days |
Complaint
Date: November 04, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: November 25, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 13, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 26, 2019Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: February 24, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 05, 2019Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: January 31, 2020Answer
Date: January 23, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.