Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Chavarri Jorge, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Rubin Tal Esq., against Hernandez Veronica, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Serena R. Murillo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSerena R. Murillo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 30, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Complaint; Filed by: Jorge Chavarri (Plaintiff); As to: Veronica Hernandez (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Intervene; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Jorge Chavarri (Plaintiff); As to: Jorge Chavarri (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Notice for Leave To File Complaint In Intervention; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Petition for Leave To File Complaint In Intervention; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Interpleader)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jorge Chavarri (Plaintiff); As to: Veronica Hernandez (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Jorge Chavarri (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Jorge Chavarri (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition for Leave to File Complaint In Interventi...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Complaint in Intervention Filed by County of Los Angeles (Interpleader)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Petition for Leave to File Complaint-In-Intervention Filed by County of Los Angeles (Interpleader)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by County of Los Angeles (Interpleader)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Jorge Chavarri (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by County of Los Angeles (Interpleader)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing to File Complaint In Intervention) Filed by County of Los Angeles (Interpleader)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Jorge Chavarri (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Petition for Leave to File Complaint-In-Intervention
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing to File Complaint In Intervention)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition for Leave to File Complaint In Interventi...))
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Complaint in Intervention
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.