Case Last Refreshed: 6 hours ago
Tillman Sarah, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Mcmillan Shawn, against 1 Through 30 Does, County Of Los Angeles A Public Entity, Hovet Carin, Puyot Noreen, Woillard-Vuksanovic Catherine, (total of 5) See All represented by Guterres Tomas Antonio, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with David Sotelo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid Sotelo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management251 days |
Filing DateOctober 24, 2019 |
CategoryCivil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Complaint
Date: October 24, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Sarah Tillman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Sarah Tillman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling notice of court order; Filed by: Sarah Tillman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Sarah Tillman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: County of Los Angeles, a public entity (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 24, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 24, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 24, 2019Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: November 12, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: November 12, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: January 08, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 08, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: January 28, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: January 15, 2020Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: January 28, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: March 02, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: March 04, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: March 17, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: June 16, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: June 26, 2020Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: October 01, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: July 01, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/06/2020
Date: October 06, 2020Notice of Settlement
Date: December 11, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: October 06, 2020Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING NOTICE OF COURT ORDER
Date: October 16, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/17/2020
Date: December 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: December 17, 2020Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: April 30, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: May 03, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: June 21, 2021Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: July 15, 2021Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Continue Case Management Conference) Filed by Sarah Tillman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Sarah Tillman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Sarah Tillman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (notice of court order) Filed by Sarah Tillman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Sarah Tillman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Sarah Tillman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by County of Los Angeles, a public entity (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Sarah Tillman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Sarah Tillman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: continuation of hearing date;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Sarah Tillman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by County of Los Angeles, a public entity (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Sarah Tillman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...))
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Answer (to Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: continuation of hearing date;))
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/17/2020)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Continue Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (notice of court order)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 03/17/2020)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/06/2020)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/16/2020)
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.