Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Trejo David, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Tai Daniel Chung-Kwang, against Does 1 Through 10 Inclusive, Nissan North America Inc, represented by Sweeney Michael P, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with John P. Doyle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn P. Doyle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management97 days |
Filing DateOctober 24, 2019 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: DAVID TREJO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC (Defendant); As to: DAVID TREJO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: DAVID TREJO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Continuance) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Complaint
Date: October 24, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 24, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 24, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 24, 2019Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: October 28, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 28, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: October 29, 2019Answer
Date: November 25, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 13, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: January 09, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 15, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: January 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE)
Date: April 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE))
Date: September 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE))
Date: February 19, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE))
Date: November 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE))
Date: April 05, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: May 17, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: June 30, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: July 26, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: October 07, 2021Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose)))
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose)))
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...))
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose); Order to Show Cause Re: Dism...))
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose)))
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose)))
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Continuance))
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Continuance) of 04/27/2020)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Notice ( OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.