Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bates By And Through His Guardian Ad Litem Tiffany Powell Yanis, Braggs Doylene, Brooks Christine, Burton Laqueeta, Cobbs Jasmine, (total of 31) See All filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Nielsen Tanner, against Nijjar Realty Inc., Pama Management Inc., Pama V Properties Lp, Regency Management Inc., represented by Carpenter Gregory, Carpenter Gregory J., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Richard J. Burdge Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard J. Burdge Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management264 days |
Filing DateOctober 24, 2019 |
CategoryBreach Of Rental/Lease Contract (Not Unlawful Detainer Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint; Filed by: Jamie Thomas (Plaintiff); As to: Nijjar Realty Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Pama Management, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 31, 2022Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Allison Salas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Pearl Thornton (Plaintiff); Theresa Walker (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Jamie Thomas (Plaintiff); Tommy Dixon (Plaintiff); Laqueeta Burton (Plaintiff) et al.
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Kevin) Filed by Kevin Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-31T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim Filed by Tiffany Powell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by Pama Management, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account Filed by Heidi Mayen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Default)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account Filed by LLesenia Martinez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance Hearing Date)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint Filed by Jamie Thomas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account Filed by Charmaine Essex (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account Filed by Kevin Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Stipulation for Leave of Court to File Second Amended Complaint Filed by Jamie Thomas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Advance Hearing Date) Filed by Tiffany Powell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-22T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...) of )
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...) of )
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Declaration (of Non-Service)
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Default))
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (1st))
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name (and Service of Process E-Mail Address)
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/23/2020)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (1st))
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Default))
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/13/2020)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name (and Service of Process E-Mail Address)
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.